U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00741
  • Case Name: Logan v. Nelson et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 04, 2023: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Docket]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • September 19, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 25, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 25, 2022: [Pro Se Litigant's Request for Issuance of Summons]
  • August 25, 2022: [Receipt]
  • August 25, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.