U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00740
  • Case Name: Wyatt v. Crow
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • December 02, 2022: [USCA Order - without Notice of Appeal]
  • December 01, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 26, 2022: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • October 11, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • October 07, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 25, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • August 25, 2022: [Receipt]
  • August 25, 2022: [File Excess Pages]
  • August 25, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.