U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00746
  • Case Name: Galka v. Cal's Convenience Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • January 17, 2023: [Protective Order]
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order]
  • November 22, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 10, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • November 02, 2022: [Docket]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • October 25, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • October 25, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 26, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 26, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 26, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.