U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00744
  • Case Name: Chapel Steel Corp v. CNC Metal Shape Construction LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Terminate Hearings]
  • October 26, 2022: [Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • October 26, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 18, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • October 06, 2022: [Docket]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • September 28, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 22, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • September 22, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 01, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 26, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • August 26, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 26, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 26, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.