U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00745
  • Case Name: Collins v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [General Order 23-1 and Consent Form]
  • January 12, 2023: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • January 11, 2023: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
  • January 11, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to Non-party]
  • December 27, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • August 26, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 26, 2022: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.