U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00747
  • Case Name: Atoka County Board of County Commissioners et al v. Walmart Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • November 28, 2022: [Stay Case]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 12, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • October 12, 2022: [Consolidate Cases]
  • October 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • September 22, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 06, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 01, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • August 26, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • August 26, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 26, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 26, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.