U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00749
  • Case Name: Jiles v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 06, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 06, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief]
  • December 06, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • November 09, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • November 09, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 09, 2022: [Consent-Do Not Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • November 09, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order]
  • October 25, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • October 25, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
  • October 25, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • August 26, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 26, 2022: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.