U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00750
  • Case Name: Pharries v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • December 28, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • December 28, 2022: [Order]
  • December 21, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • December 20, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
  • December 20, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 02, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 11, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 19, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order]
  • August 29, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 29, 2022: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.