U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00753
  • Case Name: Mitchell v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order]
  • January 03, 2023: [Social Security Admin Record]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 30, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 11, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 29, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 29, 2022: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.