U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00752
  • Case Name: Farmers Mutual Fire Insurance Company of Okarche v. HL Motor Group Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • November 08, 2022: [Docket]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Consolidate Cases]
  • September 27, 2022: [Notice of Related or Companion Case]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • September 14, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • September 13, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • September 13, 2022: [Leave]
  • September 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 29, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • August 29, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • August 29, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 29, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 29, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.