U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00751
  • Case Name: Capstone Eyecare Holdings LLC et al v. Butcher et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 05, 2023: [Scheduling Conference]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • December 06, 2022: [Docket]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • November 08, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • November 01, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • November 01, 2022: [Answer to Counterclaim]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • October 11, 2022: [Expedite]
  • October 11, 2022: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • October 11, 2022: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • October 11, 2022: [Counterclaim]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order]
  • October 11, 2022: [Notice of Pending Motions]
  • October 11, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [ADR Report by Mediator / Evaluator]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 30, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 30, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 29, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 29, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.