U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00754
  • Case Name: Jackson et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand to State Court]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 19, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Remand to State Court]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 23, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 15, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 06, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • September 06, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 30, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • August 30, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 29, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.