U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00756
  • Case Name: BB Energy USA Llc v. Keyera Energy Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Reply]
  • October 13, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 12, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 11, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • October 03, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 23, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 22, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • September 22, 2022: [Remand to State Court]
  • September 22, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 22, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • September 22, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order]
  • September 06, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 02, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • September 01, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order]
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Related or Companion Case]
  • August 30, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 30, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • August 30, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.