U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00760
  • Case Name: Banks v. Zook
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order Declining Report and Recommendation]
  • November 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Receipt]
  • October 07, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • August 30, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • August 30, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.