U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00758
  • Case Name: Dollar v. Malget
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • November 15, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order]
  • October 21, 2022: [Supplement]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order]
  • October 03, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 30, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • August 30, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.