U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00759
  • Case Name: Childers v. Valley Brook Town of et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Order to Show Cause]
November, 2022
  • November 11, 2022: [Quash]
  • November 11, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 13, 2022: [Pro Se Litigant's Request for Issuance of Summons]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 30, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.