U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00764
  • Case Name: Green v. Design Ready Controls Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • December 22, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • December 13, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 12, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • December 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 06, 2022: [Docket]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • November 21, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 04, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • November 04, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 01, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Complaint]
  • August 31, 2022: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.