U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00761
  • Case Name: Sonne et al v. VROOM Automotive LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 02, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 09, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Compel]
  • October 12, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Compel]
  • September 20, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • September 20, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • September 09, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 01, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • September 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 31, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.