U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00766
  • Case Name: Higley v. Harvonek
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order for Response]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 29, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 28, 2022: [Receipt]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 10, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • November 01, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • November 01, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 17, 2022: [Extension of Time]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • August 31, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • August 31, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • August 31, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.