U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00770
  • Case Name: Murphree v. United Services Automobile Association et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand to State Court]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 18, 2022: [Reply]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 30, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 27, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 27, 2022: [Remand to State Court]
  • September 06, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • September 06, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • August 31, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 31, 2022: [Order of Recusal]
  • August 31, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 31, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.