U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00768
  • Case Name: Hodgens et al v. Demontrond Auto Country Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 20, 2023: [Dismiss]
  • January 03, 2023: [Docket]
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order]
  • December 09, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Response to Motion]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • September 14, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 14, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • September 14, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 06, 2022: [Extension of Time]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 31, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 31, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.