U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00765
  • Case Name: Henderson v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 19, 2023: [Extension of Time]
  • January 09, 2023: [General Order 23-1 and Consent Form]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • December 20, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
  • December 20, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 01, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to Non-party]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • August 31, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 31, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 31, 2022: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.