U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00769
  • Case Name: Bowman et al v. PKL Orthodontics PC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order]
  • November 22, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 21, 2022: [Status Report]
  • November 02, 2022: [Docket]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 27, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • September 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order for Response]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 31, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 31, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.