U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00772
  • Case Name: Chaballa et al v. SP Healthcare Management LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [~Notice (other)]
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan]
  • November 08, 2022: [Docket]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • October 07, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • September 21, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 21, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order]
  • September 10, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 07, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • September 06, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order]
  • September 01, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 31, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.