U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00773
  • Case Name: Williams v. Jones City Town of et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • September 26, 2022: [File Excess Pages]
  • September 14, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • September 14, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 07, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • September 07, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • September 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 31, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.