U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00771
  • Case Name: Ace Screws LLC v. Elite Force Building Solutions LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 31, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 24, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • October 03, 2022: [Docket]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • September 27, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • September 27, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 27, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • September 01, 2022: [Summons Issued]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 31, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 31, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.