U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00775
  • Case Name: Williams et al v. Clarity Telecom Llc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Summons Issued]
  • January 17, 2023: [Third Party Complaint]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • January 13, 2023: [Leave]
  • January 04, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • December 07, 2022: [Docket]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • October 20, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Substitute Party]
  • October 07, 2022: [Substitute Party]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • September 22, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • September 13, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • September 13, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • September 13, 2022: [Notice of Filing Notice of Removal]
  • September 09, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 07, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • September 07, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • September 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 01, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • September 01, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.