U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00774
  • Case Name: RTPR LLC v. Krishnaraj et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Reopen Case]
November, 2022
  • November 11, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 04, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 21, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • September 30, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • September 08, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • September 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 07, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • September 06, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • September 06, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 01, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • September 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 01, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.