U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00776
  • Case Name: Rackley v. Leading Life Senior Living Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Summons Issued]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • January 13, 2023: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 19, 2022: [Status Report]
  • December 18, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 16, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 08, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 04, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 01, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • September 01, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 01, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.