U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00779
  • Case Name: Plater v. Poirot et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Order]
  • January 05, 2023: [Dismiss]
  • January 05, 2023: [Special Report]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 27, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • December 27, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 17, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Objections]
  • October 21, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • October 04, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Receipt]
  • September 30, 2022: [Leave]
  • September 30, 2022: [Order]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • September 02, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • September 02, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 02, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.