U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00782
  • Case Name: Carr v. HL Motor Group Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order]
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
  • October 25, 2022: [Notice of Filing Notice of Removal]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • September 27, 2022: [Consolidate Cases]
  • September 27, 2022: [Notice of Related or Companion Case]
  • September 19, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • September 18, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • September 13, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • September 13, 2022: [Leave]
  • September 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 06, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • September 03, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • September 03, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 02, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.