U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00780
  • Case Name: Plater v. Topping et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Leave]
  • December 28, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • November 28, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • November 23, 2022: [Receipt]
  • November 08, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • November 08, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order]
  • October 03, 2022: [Leave]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • September 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 02, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • September 02, 2022: [Brief]
  • September 02, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 02, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.