U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00778
  • Case Name: Swan v. Oklahoma City Police Department et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • December 02, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Receipt]
  • November 03, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • November 03, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Receipt]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 20, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 02, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • September 02, 2022: [Pro Se Litigant's Request for Issuance of Summons]
  • September 02, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
  • September 02, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 02, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.