U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00787
  • Case Name: Bridge et al v. Oklahoma State Department of Education et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 06, 2023: [Surreply]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • December 14, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order]
  • December 07, 2022: [Strike]
  • December 02, 2022: [Reply]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Reply]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 18, 2022: [Leave]
  • November 18, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • November 17, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 17, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • November 16, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 16, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • November 14, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 02, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • November 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • October 25, 2022: [Leave]
  • October 24, 2022: [Leave]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 13, 2022: [Certificate of Service - NON SUMMONS]
  • October 07, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 06, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • October 06, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 05, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 04, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • October 04, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 03, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order]
  • September 29, 2022: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • September 26, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 22, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • September 16, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 15, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • September 15, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 14, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • September 14, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 06, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • September 06, 2022: [Leave]
  • September 06, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 06, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • September 06, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 06, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.