U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00786
  • Case Name: Dotson v. Pressley
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 15, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order]
  • December 09, 2022: [Response to Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
  • November 28, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order]
  • November 22, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 21, 2022: [Default Judgment]
  • November 17, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
  • November 02, 2022: [Docket]
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Strike]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • September 12, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 06, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 06, 2022: [Receipt]
  • September 06, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.