U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00814
  • Case Name: Castellanos v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [General Order 23-1 and Consent Form]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • December 23, 2022: [Order]
  • December 21, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • December 07, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
  • December 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 07, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order]
  • September 15, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • September 15, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 15, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 15, 2022: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.