U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00809
  • Case Name: Grain Dealers Mutual Insurance Company v. A&W Welding and Fencing LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Response to Motion]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 09, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • December 23, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 12, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 06, 2022: [Summons Issued]
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • November 03, 2022: [Summons Issued]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • September 15, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 15, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • September 15, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.