U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00815
  • Case Name: Oklahoma Dental Properties LLC v. Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order]
  • November 21, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • November 07, 2022: [Docket]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • September 16, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 15, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • September 15, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • September 15, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.