U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00817
  • Case Name: Gallegly v. Cordell Memorial Hospital Foundation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Reply]
  • January 17, 2023: [Response to Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 15, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 15, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 13, 2022: [Dismiss]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 28, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • November 28, 2022: [Leave]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Reply]
  • October 13, 2022: [Response to Motion]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • September 22, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • September 20, 2022: [Notice of Pending Motions]
  • September 20, 2022: [Certificate]
  • September 15, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 15, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • September 15, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.