U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00818
  • Case Name: Phillips v. National General Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • December 27, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • December 27, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 27, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 13, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • December 08, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 07, 2022: [Leave]
  • December 05, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • November 09, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order]
  • November 07, 2022: [Docket]
  • November 04, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • September 16, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 16, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • September 16, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.