U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00822
  • Case Name: Wake Energy LLC v. Canvas Energy LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order]
  • December 20, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • November 07, 2022: [Docket]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • October 28, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • October 28, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 12, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 05, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • September 22, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 20, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 19, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • September 16, 2022: [Complaint]
  • September 16, 2022: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.