U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00820
  • Case Name: Dotson v. RGS Financial Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Protective Order]
  • January 09, 2023: [Protective Order]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 29, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 27, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 21, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 24, 2022: [Docket]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • October 18, 2022: [Leave]
  • October 18, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • October 18, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • October 18, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 16, 2022: [Receipt]
  • September 16, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 16, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.