U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00819
  • Case Name: Spaulding v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • January 13, 2023: [Response to Motion]
  • January 02, 2023: [Attorney Fees]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand to Agency]
  • November 16, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • November 16, 2022: [Remand to Agency]
  • November 16, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • November 16, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
  • November 16, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 16, 2022: [Complaint Social Security]
  • September 16, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.