U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00823
  • Case Name: Ray v. Quisenberry et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Report and Recommendation]
  • January 20, 2023: [Receipt]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 21, 2022: [Receipt]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • October 24, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 19, 2022: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • September 19, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • September 19, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 19, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • September 19, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.