U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00821
  • Case Name: Wake Energy LLC v. Mustang Gas Products LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • September 22, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 20, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 19, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • September 19, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 19, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.