U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00833
  • Case Name: Jackson v. Williams et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Mail Returned]
  • January 13, 2023: [Judgment]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order]
  • January 11, 2023: [Mail Returned]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 20, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order]
  • September 20, 2022: [Complaint]
  • September 20, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.