U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00824
  • Case Name: Mays v. Doe et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Mail Returned]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Letter]
  • November 01, 2022: [Letter]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • October 25, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
  • October 18, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
  • October 17, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • October 17, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • September 20, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • September 20, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 20, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.