U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00830
  • Case Name: Tres Management Inc v. CBIZ Insurance Services Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 02, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 02, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order for Response]
  • November 21, 2022: [Leave]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 14, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • October 31, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • October 31, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 25, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • October 19, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 14, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • October 14, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • October 14, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 03, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • September 20, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 20, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.