U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00831
  • Case Name: Mid-Continent Packaging Inc v. The Interflex Group Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 08, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 13, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • October 13, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 12, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 04, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • September 21, 2022: [Receipt]
  • September 20, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 20, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • September 20, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 20, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.