U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00836
  • Case Name: Robertson et al v. University of Central Oklahoma et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 21, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • November 21, 2022: [Joint Status Report]
  • November 02, 2022: [Docket]
  • November 01, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • October 13, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • October 13, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 06, 2022: [Affidavit of Service - NON SUMMONS]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • September 30, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 27, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order for Response]
  • September 21, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • September 21, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 20, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • September 20, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 20, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.